Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/07/2009