Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/24/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/02/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/27/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/11/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/19/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/19/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/16/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/01/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/20/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/20/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/02/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/15/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/13/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/21/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/21/2010