Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/06/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2009