Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/09/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/06/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 05/11/2010