Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/25/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/04/2009