Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/24/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/25/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/05/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/05/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/05/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/12/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/20/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/20/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/21/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/04/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/18/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/15/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/15/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/31/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/26/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/10/2010