There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the federally occupied building located at McKinley Avenue and Third Street, SW., Canton, Ohio, as the "Ralph Regula Federal Building and United States Courthouse".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at McKinley Avenue and Third Street, SW., Canton, Ohio, as the "Ralph Regula Federal Building and United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/19/2009Became Public Law No: 111-74. (TXT | PDF)
10/19/2009Signed by President.
10/07/2009Presented to President.
09/24/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9857)
09/24/2009Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/11/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 330).(text: CR 6/9/2009 H6362)
06/08/2009Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-140.
03/24/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/19/2009Became Public Law No: 111-74. (TXT | PDF)
10/19/2009Signed by President.
10/07/2009HousePresented to President.
09/25/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/24/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9857)
09/24/2009SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/15/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
06/11/2009-12:32pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/11/2009-12:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/11/2009-12:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 330). (text: CR 6/9/2009 H6362)
06/11/2009-12:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6551)
06/09/2009-6:27pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/09/2009-5:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1687.
06/09/2009-5:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6362-6366)
06/09/2009-5:58pmHouseMr. Boccieri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/08/2009HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 64.
06/08/2009HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-140.
06/04/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/04/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/04/2009HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
03/25/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/24/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/24/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/24/2009 Referred to
06/04/2009 Markup by
06/08/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-140
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/25/2009 Referred to
06/04/2009 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works06/15/2009 Referred to
09/24/2009 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1687. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-74 (10/19/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 8, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Administrator of General Services to ensure that the federally occupied building located at McKinley Avenue and Third Street, S.W., Canton, Ohio, is known and designated as the "Ralph Regula Federal Building and United States Courthouse."