Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/15/2009