Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/28/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/28/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/26/2009