Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/10/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/17/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/10/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/10/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/17/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/24/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/24/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/24/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/25/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/12/2010