Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/25/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/08/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/17/2009