Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/31/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/31/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/31/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/31/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/31/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/31/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/01/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/01/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/22/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/30/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/18/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/18/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/20/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/09/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/16/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/17/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/10/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/06/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/27/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/15/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/20/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/09/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/16/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/23/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/29/2010