Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/28/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/29/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/07/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2009