Refine your search

Showing 10 of 10 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/09/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-292.
12/09/2010 Signed by President.
11/29/2010 Presented to President.
11/18/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 254 - 152 (Roll no. 578).(consideration: CR H7563-7568, H7575; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7560-7563)
09/29/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 290 - 131 (Roll no. 441).
05/06/2010 Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 268 - 147 (Roll no. 251).
05/04/2010 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 111-474.
03/25/2009 Introduced in House