Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/06/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/06/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2010