Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/21/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/05/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/24/2010