Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 01/09/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/14/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 01/14/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/23/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/05/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/22/2010