Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/09/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/09/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/23/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/17/2009