Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/20/2009