Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/26/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/22/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/23/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/23/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/28/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/28/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/06/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/17/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/17/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/08/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/15/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/15/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/15/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/13/2010