Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/13/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/27/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/26/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009