Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/31/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/31/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/31/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/31/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/31/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/31/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/31/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/31/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/22/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/07/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/07/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/14/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/20/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/10/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/23/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/09/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/10/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/28/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/14/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/15/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/25/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/10/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/15/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/16/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/28/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/17/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/29/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/02/2010