Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/02/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2009