Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/2009