Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/02/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/29/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/18/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 11/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/18/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/18/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/07/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/11/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/11/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/12/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/12/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/24/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/24/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/24/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2010