Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/08/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/08/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/14/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/27/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/28/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/03/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/03/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/10/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/10/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/11/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/11/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/12/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/25/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/04/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/04/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/19/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/28/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/29/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/30/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/05/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/05/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/06/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/06/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/13/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/13/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/13/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/14/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/24/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/10/2010