Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/11/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/24/2010