Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/22/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/11/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/11/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/10/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/17/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/09/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/29/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 11/06/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/24/2010