Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/08/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/05/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/16/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/19/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/08/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/08/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/14/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/14/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/14/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/15/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/12/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/12/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/13/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/20/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/02/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/26/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/26/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/02/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/03/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/03/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/12/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/12/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/16/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/23/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/26/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/27/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/14/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/15/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/22/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/22/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/30/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/01/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/28/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/10/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 08/10/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/16/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/23/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/28/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/28/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/01/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/01/2010