Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/27/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/27/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/26/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/26/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 02/26/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/06/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/29/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/02/2009