There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Susan B. Anthony and Frederick Douglass Prenatal Nondiscrimination Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit discrimination against the unborn on the basis of sex or race, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/31/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/27/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/31/2009Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/31/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 03/31/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/31/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/27/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/15/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/21/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/23/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/08/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/08/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/31/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/27/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties04/27/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1822.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1822. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/31/2009)

Susan B. Anthony and Frederick Douglass Prenatal Nondiscrimination Act of 2009 - Imposes criminal penalties on anyone who knowingly or knowingly attempts to: (1) perform an abortion knowing that the abortion is sought based on the sex, gender, color or race of the child, or the race of a parent; (2) use force or the threat of force to intentionally injure or intimidate any person for the purpose of coercing a sex-selection or race-selection abortion; or (3) solicit or accept funds to finance a sex-selection abortion or a race-selection abortion.

Authorizes injunctive relief.

Deems a violation of this act to be prohibited discrimination under title VI (Federally Assisted Programs) of the Civil Rights Act of 1964. (Violators of title VI lose federal funding.)

Provides for a private right of action for appropriate relief: (1) for the father if he is married to the mother at the time she has such an abortion; or (2) for the maternal grandparents of the unborn child if the mother is under 18 at the time of the abortion. Declares that appropriate relief includes money damages for all injuries, whether psychological, physical, or financial, including loss of companionship and support.

Requires a medical or mental health professional to report known or suspected violations to law enforcement authorities. Imposes criminal penalties for a failure to so report.

Prohibits a woman having such an abortion from being prosecuted or held civilly liable.

Excludes from the definition of "abortion" actions taken to terminate a pregnancy if the intent is to save the life or preserve the health of the unborn child, remove a dead unborn child caused by spontaneous abortion, or remove an ectopic pregnancy.