Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/05/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/12/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/19/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/24/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/29/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/14/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/16/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/25/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/02/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/04/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/05/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 12/01/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/10/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/14/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/16/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/16/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/12/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/03/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/03/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/22/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/24/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/24/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/02/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/16/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/13/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/26/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/21/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/23/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/10/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/23/2010