Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/31/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/13/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/09/2010