Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/31/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/31/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/23/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/07/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/23/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/22/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/20/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/14/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/24/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/29/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/20/2010