Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 10/29/2009