Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/05/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/21/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/03/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/03/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/18/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/22/2010