Refine your search

Refined by:

Louisiana Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/04/2009