Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/05/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/21/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/26/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/13/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/01/2010