Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/13/2010