Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/21/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/02/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/10/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/10/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/03/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/13/2010