There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Business Development Centers Modernization Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Development Centers Modernization Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to modernize Small Business Development Centers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 412 - 20 (Roll no. 878).(text: CR 11/6/2009 H12473-12475)
04/01/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/09/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
11/07/2009-10:15amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2009-10:15amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 412 - 20 (Roll no. 878). (text: CR 11/6/2009 H12473-12475)
11/07/2009-10:08amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H12596)
11/06/2009-11:08amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Velazquez objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
11/06/2009-10:40amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1845.
11/06/2009-10:40amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12473-12477)
11/06/2009-10:40amHouseMs. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/13/2009HouseProvisions of Measure Incorporated into H.R. 2352.
04/30/2009HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Small Business Subcommittee on Rural Development, Entrepreneurship and Trade
04/30/2009HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Small Business Subcommittee on Rural Development, Entrepreneurship and Trade
04/01/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
04/01/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Rural Development, Entrepreneurship and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
04/01/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/30/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/02/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business04/01/2009 Referred to
House Small Business Subcommittee on Rural Development, Entrepreneurship and Trade04/01/2009 Referred to
04/30/2009 Markup by
04/30/2009 Reported by
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship11/09/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1845. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/07/2009)

Small Business Development Centers Modernization Act of 2009 - Amends the Small Business Act relating to small business development centers (SBDCs) (centers established through the Small Business Administration [SBA] to provide advisory, operational, and technical assistance to small businesses) to: (1) require institutions of higher education that are provided SBDC grants to be accredited; (2) require SBDC employee hirings to be at the sole discretion of an SBDC without input or approval from SBA officers or employees; (3) eliminate a matching funds requirement with respect to SBDC grant programs conducted in areas in which a disaster has occurred; and (4) allow grant distributions with respect to two or more SBDCs located in the same state only when no applicant has applied to serve the entire state.

Directs the Administrator to establish SBDC grant programs for: (1) access to credit and capital; (2) procurement training and assistance; (3) green entrepreneurs training; (4) main street stabilization; and (5) small manufacturers transition (business change or reorganization) assistance. Limits grants to $300,000 per entity ($250,000 with respect to the latter two programs). Authorizes appropriations under each program for FY2010-FY2011.

Prohibits funds recovered under an SBDC program through fees assessed to small business clients from being considered matching funds.

Authorizes appropriations for the SBDC program for FY2010-FY2011.