Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/12/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/31/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/20/2009