Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/05/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/23/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/24/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/31/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/31/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/31/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/31/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/31/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/15/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/15/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 10/15/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/15/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/15/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/15/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/15/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/21/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/21/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/21/2009