Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/01/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/01/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/01/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/01/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/29/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/25/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/25/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/30/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/14/2010