There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Birthright Citizenship Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 301 of the Immigration and Nationality Act to clarify those classes of individuals born in the United States who are nationals and citizens of the United States at birth.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/02/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/26/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/02/2009Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/02/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/02/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/02/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/02/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/04/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/11/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/17/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/30/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/30/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/03/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/25/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/16/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary04/02/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law05/26/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1868. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/02/2009)

Birthright Citizenship Act of 2009 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to consider a person born in the United States "subject to the jurisdiction" of the United States for citizenship at birth purposes if the person is born in the United States of parents, one of whom is: (1) a U.S. citizen or national; (2) a lawful permanent resident alien whose residence is in the United States; or (3) an alien performing active service in the U.S. Armed Forces.