Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/22/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/27/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/30/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/06/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/07/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/07/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/07/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/12/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/08/2009