Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/30/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/12/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/10/2009