Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2009