Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/22/2010