Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/27/2010